Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
De La Hoz, Cindy, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Trujillo, Carlos, Esq., against Citizens Property Insurance Corp, represented by Trujillo, Carlos, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2014 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: October 26, 2015Joint Stipulation
Date: March 31, 2016Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 03, 2015Interrogatories
Date: August 27, 2014Request for Production
Date: August 27, 2014Request for Admissions
Date: August 27, 2014Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 27, 2014Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 13, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 19, 2014Objection to Notice to Produce
Date: November 20, 2014Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 30, 2014Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 30, 2014Request for Production
Date: January 06, 2015Response to Request to Produce
Date: January 06, 2015Agreed Order
Date: January 13, 2015Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: January 06, 2015Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 30, 2015Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: October 22, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;374296;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/4c55fdd6-fa21-4750-bdf6-80919068c8c4/results/b2e00433-65c2-471f-85d7-ca7dcbc6577e/lines/378fad09-240c-4af7-8e21-a0b5e0693858/Doc JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICEParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corp |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;363466;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/4c55fdd6-fa21-4750-bdf6-80919068c8c4/results/b2e00433-65c2-471f-85d7-ca7dcbc6577e/lines/32940c88-2e95-417f-81c3-761f747666cd/Doc Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel |
|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;390448;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/4c55fdd6-fa21-4750-bdf6-80919068c8c4/results/b2e00433-65c2-471f-85d7-ca7dcbc6577e/lines/ed56e7e5-f87d-4981-887c-5536fb3c832f/Doc Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Plaintiff De La Hoz, Cindy |
|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;381603;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/4c55fdd6-fa21-4750-bdf6-80919068c8c4/results/b2e00433-65c2-471f-85d7-ca7dcbc6577e/lines/6b2f8e7c-6ada-4bdf-9ebe-86edf3f6c72b/Doc Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff De La Hoz, Cindy |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;369322;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/4c55fdd6-fa21-4750-bdf6-80919068c8c4/results/b2e00433-65c2-471f-85d7-ca7dcbc6577e/lines/2af3b153-2e7a-436b-a76b-014c659c0001/Doc Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Party: Plaintiff De La Hoz, Cindy Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corp |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;370517;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/4c55fdd6-fa21-4750-bdf6-80919068c8c4/results/b2e00433-65c2-471f-85d7-ca7dcbc6577e/lines/21c7a299-f74c-4334-bb72-267a2613ba7a/Doc Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;380900;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/4c55fdd6-fa21-4750-bdf6-80919068c8c4/results/b2e00433-65c2-471f-85d7-ca7dcbc6577e/lines/f093b258-3899-4325-a32f-7d2e87d60e07/Doc NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;375714;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/4c55fdd6-fa21-4750-bdf6-80919068c8c4/results/b2e00433-65c2-471f-85d7-ca7dcbc6577e/lines/11cdf3e5-f4a6-4c56-a7ab-8ea18f6948ca/Doc Notice of Unavailability Party: Attorney Barakat, Munir D |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;374520;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/4c55fdd6-fa21-4750-bdf6-80919068c8c4/results/b2e00433-65c2-471f-85d7-ca7dcbc6577e/lines/04158c8f-2b71-4113-80c5-3c706590a316/Doc Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff De La Hoz, Cindy |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;375215;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/4c55fdd6-fa21-4750-bdf6-80919068c8c4/results/b2e00433-65c2-471f-85d7-ca7dcbc6577e/lines/0f57d590-666e-49a7-8869-873fb3668483/Doc Response to Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff De La Hoz, Cindy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.