Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nationstar Mtg Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lewis, Lisa M, against Delima, Maria, represented by Marrero, Julio C, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 13, 2013Emergency Motion
Date: August 16, 2013Motion
Date: April 04, 2014Order
Date: August 20, 2013Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 31, 2014Motion
Date: November 14, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Comment: Original Note & Mortgage Documents mailed back on 10/19/15 |
|
May 14, 2014 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing May 08, 2014 at 1:30 PM RM#519 |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE, CANCELLING NOTICE OF LIS PENENS, AND SETTING ASmE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS ND TO SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES IN THE COURT FILEParty: Plaintiff Nationstar Mtg LLC | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: LISA LEWIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A044148; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed After Hearing |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney 14th day of May, 2014 |
|
February 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.