Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gryglewicz, Nathan Paul, against Cavalry Portfolio Services Llc, Franks, Kristin Nicole, Franks, Matthew Thomas, Party 1, Unknown, Party 2, Unknown, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO LOST OR MISPLACED ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: September 12, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE NISSAN
Date: September 13, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED KRISTIN NICOLE FRANKS AKA KRISTIN FRANKS
Date: September 13, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC
Date: October 18, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: KRISTIN NICOLE FRANKS
Date: October 18, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: UNKNOWN PARTY #2
Date: October 18, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: UNKNOWN PARTY #1
Date: October 18, 2019SUMMONS
Date: September 12, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 14, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY #1
Date: September 13, 2019Notice of Filing AFFIDAVITS OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AND REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: November 15, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY #2
Date: September 13, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROU SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Date: September 13, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: December 23, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED MATTHEW THOMAS FRANKS AKA MATTHEW FRANKS AKA MATHEW FRANKS
Date: September 13, 2019Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: December 31, 2019NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: January 07, 2020Notice of Filing STANDARD AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: January 02, 2020Notice of Filing AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: January 29, 2020MTN FOR DEFAULT
Date: January 10, 2020Notice Of Hearing
Date: January 02, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: February 17, 2020Notice of Filing AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: February 17, 2020MOTION TO RESCHEDULE APRIL 23, 2020 FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: June 28, 2021Notice of Sale SIGNED 12/16/21
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Sale 4-23-2020 (MAILED TO TELEGRPH IN SASE PROVIDED)
Date: February 19, 2020HEARING DISPOSITION FORM
Date: February 17, 2020MOTION TO RESCHEDULE APRIL 23, 2020 FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: June 30, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE (DATE IS UNCLEAR)
Date: March 09, 2020MOTION TO CANCEL APRIL 23, 2020 FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: April 02, 2020FINAL ORDER CANCELING APRIL 23, 2020 FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: April 15, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE 4-23-20
Date: April 03, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: May 12, 2022RETURNED MAIL KRISTIN NICOLE FRANKS
Date: March 16, 2022ORDER RESCHEDULING SALE FOR 12-16-21
Date: October 25, 2021RECEIPT COURT REGISTRY-VOIDED-REASON STATED ON ATTACHED DOCUMENTS
Date: May 12, 2022RETURNED MAIL KRISTIN NICOLE FRANKS
Date: November 03, 2021RETURNED MAIL MATTHEW THOMAS FRANKS
Date: November 03, 2021SALE WAS NOT CONDUCTED AS NO PROOF OF PUBLICATION WAS FILED
Date: December 16, 2021Notice of Sale
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Sale (RESCHEDULED) 5/12/22
Date: April 11, 2022MOTION TO CANCEL DEC 16, 2021 FORECLOSURE SALE AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: December 08, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE 5/12/22
Date: May 10, 2022RECEIPT
Date: May 12, 2022MOTION TO RESCHEDULE DEC 16, 2021 FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: February 04, 2022FINAL ORDER RESCHEDULING DEC 16, 2021 FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Sale (RESCHEDULED) 5/12/22 SIGNED
Date: April 11, 2022RETURNED MAIL MATTHEW THOMAS FRANK
Date: March 16, 2022FORECLOSURE BID SHEET
Date: May 12, 2022THIRD PARTY BIDDER INFORMATION SHEET
Date: May 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: May 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: May 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT SIGNED
Date: May 25, 2022RECEIPT COURT REGISTRY
Date: May 12, 2022RECEIPT FROM FINANCE FOR COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS & FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: June 06, 2022EMAIL FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY REQUESTING CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: May 24, 2022REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT KRISTIN FRANKS
Date: September 12, 2019REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT MATHEW FRANKS AKA MATTHEW FRANKS
Date: September 12, 2019REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT KRISTIN FRANKS
Date: September 12, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 12, 2019COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: September 12, 2019MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: September 12, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: September 12, 2019ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: September 20, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: MATTHEW THOMAS FRANKS
Date: October 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS ROC FUNDS IN THE AMT OF $80,000.00 CK#1847 PAYABLE TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION C/O ALBERTELLI LAW TRUST ACCOUNT DATED 6/7/2022 | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FROM FINANCE FOR COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS & FINAL JUDGMENT | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT SIGNED | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY REQUESTING CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT COURT REGISTRY-VOIDED-REASON STATED ON ATTACHED DOCUMENTS | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE BID SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.