Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Crosscountry Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Vargas, Gina M, against Lakes At Woodlawn Homeowners A, The Unknown Tenant In Possessi, United States Of America, Unknown Spouse Of Tara Wade, Wade, Tara, (total of 5) See All represented by Stewart, Gerald Bernard, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with CASON, JODI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASON, JODI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 15, 2023Sworn Complaint
Date: February 15, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: February 15, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- #202300000996
Date: February 15, 2023Certificate OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: February 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TARA WADE
Date: February 15, 2023STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: February 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED LAKES AT WOODLAWN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC
Date: February 15, 2023ANSWER OF LAKES AT WOODLAWN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC
Date: March 10, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED THE UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION
Date: February 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: February 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED/TARA WADE
Date: March 14, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED UNK SPOUSE OF TARA WADE
Date: February 15, 2023ANSWER CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: March 02, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - UNEXECUTED/NO UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION
Date: March 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - UNEXECUTED/NO SPOUSE FOR TARA WADE
Date: March 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA- 02/27/2023 AT 3:20 PM
Date: March 16, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED TARA WADE- 03/07/2023 AT 3:10 PM
Date: March 16, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - UNEXECUTED UNK SPOUSE OF TARA WADE- NOT FOUND
Date: March 16, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED THE UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION- NOT FOUND
Date: March 16, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR TARA WADE
Date: March 17, 2023ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: March 17, 2023HEARING FORM
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING DEFENDANTS
Date: March 20, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WEDNESDAY SETPTEMBER 20 2023 AT 9:00 AM
Date: July 21, 2023PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER INACTIVATING CASE
Date: September 26, 2023HEARING FORM
Date: September 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER INACTIVATING CASE | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to INACTIVE | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 9/20/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JODI CASON presiding. | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WEDNESDAY SETPTEMBER 20 2023 AT 9:00 AM | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE SETTING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 7/19/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JODI CASON presiding. | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - CIVIL ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS- WEDNESDAY JULY 19 2023 AT 9:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.