Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cone, Dylan T, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carlson Esq, David, against Frederick, Annessa S, Hornbuckle, Evan R, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the Eighth Judicial Circuit in Alachua County, Florida. The plaintiff, Dylan T. Cone, is suing the defendants, Evan R. Hornbuckle and Annessa S. Frederick, for damages in excess of $30,000. The complain...
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Receipt: 464494 Date: 01/07/2021
Date: January 07, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED
Date: January 07, 2021PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ANNESSA S FREDERICK
Date: January 07, 2021PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT EVAN R HORNBUCKLE
Date: January 07, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT ANNESSA S FREDERICK
Date: January 07, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT EVAN R HORNBUCKLE
Date: January 07, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ANNESSA S FREDERICK
Date: January 07, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT EVAN R HORNBUCKLE
Date: January 07, 202120 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO EVAN R HORNBUCKLE Receipt: 464494 Date: 01/07/2021
Date: January 07, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: February 11, 202120 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANNESSA S FREDERICK Receipt: 464494 Date: 01/07/2021
Date: January 07, 2021ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: February 11, 2021NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2021DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2021DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES #1-29 TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 17, 2021DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES #1-3 TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 17, 2021DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF FOR DOWNLOAD OF SOCIAL MEDIA ACCOUNT
Date: March 17, 2021DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 17, 2021DEFENDANT'S SOCIAL MEDIA REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 17, 2021DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 17, 2021ANNESSA FREDERICK'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 18, 2021EVAN R HORNBUCKLE'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 18, 2021DEFENDANT ANNESSA S FREDERICK'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 18, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT'S (REOPEN)
Date: March 26, 2021DEFENDANT EVAN R HORNBUCKLE'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 18, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION
Date: March 31, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 15, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 15, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' SOCIAL MEDIA REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 15, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' REQUES FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 15, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 15, 2021ANNESSA S. FREDERICK'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 19, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL
Date: April 28, 2021NOTICE OF WITHDRAWING CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 04, 2021EVAN R HORNBUCKLE'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 05, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: May 07, 2021FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 14, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: May 14, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 21, 2021DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: June 02, 2021NOTICE FOR TRIAL
Date: June 17, 2021ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: June 18, 2021STIPULATION AS TO PROPOSED TRIAL TERM
Date: June 28, 2021ORDER CANCELING
Date: July 09, 2021ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: July 15, 2021DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: July 26, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, DYLAN T CONE
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: August 27, 2021SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 27, 2021DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: September 08, 2021PLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF 10-DAY NOTICE PERIOD FOR PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES AND REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 14, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: September 27, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY
Date: October 25, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: November 10, 2021DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: December 02, 2021MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT (FULL SETTLEMENT)
Date: December 03, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)
Date: January 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES) | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT (FULL SETTLEMENT) | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL OF NON-OBJECTION | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF’S WAIVER OF 10-DAY NOTICE PERIOD FOR PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES AND REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF 10-DAY NOTICE PERIOD FOR PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES AND REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.