Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bowen Esq, Robert, against Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By Through, Botha, Anna, Regions Bank, Sparrow Condominium Inc, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts with Robert E. Roundtree, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert E. Roundtree, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Res. - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: September 21, 2012MOTION TO RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS
Date: April 17, 2017MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL (REOPEN)
Date: June 23, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SPARROW CONDOMINIUM INC
Date: October 23, 2012AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 18, 2013MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL(REOPEN)
Date: June 09, 2014ANSWER TO VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY: SPARROW CONDOMINIUM INC
Date: December 30, 2013ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL
Date: June 23, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY FROM DEPUTY CLERK (1) ENCLOSURE | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER (BILLING NOTICE FOR FILING FEES) Civil Billing Letter Sent on: 05/25/2017 12:50:36.34 | |
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK'S FEE ON REOPEN FILING FEE PER F.S. 28.241 (1) (B) FOR MOTION FILED 04/17/2017 Receipt: 402924 Date: 06/05/2017 | |
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE (RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE 6/6/2017) SCS (MAIL RET'D AS TO ANNA BOTHA ON 06/13/17; NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED) | |
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | 99 CLOSED | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO COUNSEL | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Reopened this date | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.