Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Williams, Stephanie L, filed a(n) Declaratory Judgment case against Hoffman, Karmin K, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
|
This complaint appears to be a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of Rirgwur, RogqmTy, Florida. The document is not clear about the nature of the complaint, but it mentions a petitioner requesting the court to take action. There is no specific...
PETITION TO AWARD TITLE OF ABANDON VEHICLE STEPHANIE L WILLIAMS (PLAINTIFF);
Date: June 10, 2021MAILING ENVELOPE STEPHANIE L WILLIAMS (PLAINTIFF);
Date: June 10, 2021COPY OF BILLING LETTER WITH HAND WRITTEN NOTATIONS
Date: June 18, 2021LETTER TO THE JUDGE
Date: July 01, 2021LETTER TO JUDGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: November 30, 2021ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)
Date: December 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FOR SRS CORRECTION ONLY- CASE CLOSED | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES) | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ALERT CANCELLED INDIGENT canceled on: 12/16/2021 For: WILLIAMS, STEPHANIE L | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO THE JUDGE | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF BILLING LETTER WITH HAND WRITTEN NOTATIONS | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT) | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ALERT ISSUED INDIGENT issued on: 06/18/2021 For: WILLIAMS, STEPHANIE L Bond Amt: Bond Type: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.