We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Bianca Baten V. Blanche Queen

Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago

Baten, Bianca filed a(n) Tort case against Queen, Blanche, in the jurisdiction of District of Columbia. This case was filed in District of Columbia Superior Courts with Ross, Maurice presiding.

Case Details for v. Queen, Blanche

Judge

Ross, Maurice Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

November 23, 2022

Category

Tort

Last Refreshed

July 31, 2023

Filing Location

District of Columbia, DC

Parties for v. Queen, Blanche

Plaintiffs

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Queen, Blanche

Other Parties

Baten, Bianca (Party)

Pro Se (Attorney)

Case Documents for v. Queen, Blanche

Case Events for v. Queen, Blanche

Type Description
Docket Event Notice
Docket Event Order Filed and Entered on Docket (Judicial Officer: Clark, Jeanette J)
Signed on: 01/17/2023
Docket Event Affidavit/Declaration Filed
Docketed On: 01/03/2023
Docket Event Order Sua Sponte Entered on Docket (Judicial Officer: Zeldon, Joan)
Signed on: 12/30/2022
Docket Event Order Filed and Entered on Docket (Judicial Officer: Mitchell-Rankin, Zinora)
Signed on: 12/13/2022
Docket Event Notice of Hearing on Plt's Req for Temp Restraining Order
Docket Event Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Summons and Complaint
Docketed On: 11/29/2022
Docket Event Initial Order [Remote] (Judicial Officer: Ross, Maurice)
Docket Event Complaint Filed
Filed by: Plaintiff Baten, Bianca
Docket Event Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Filed (Judicial Officer: Clark, Jeanette J)
Docketed on: 11/23/2022
See all events