We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Lauren Hope V. Encompass Insurance Company Of Amer

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Hope, Lauren, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Forcina Jr., Anthony N, Jones Jr, Francis J, against Encompass Insurance Co Of America, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with HERLIHY, JEROME O presiding.

Case Details for Hope, Lauren v. Encompass Insurance Co Of America

Judge

HERLIHY, JEROME O

Filing Date

January 04, 2013

Category

Debt / Breach Of Contract

Last Refreshed

October 09, 2022

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

New Castle County, DE

Matter Type

General Creditor

Parties for Hope, Lauren v. Encompass Insurance Co Of America

Plaintiffs

Hope, Lauren

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Forcina Jr., Anthony N

Jones Jr, Francis J

Defendants

Encompass Insurance Co Of America

Other Parties

Herlihy, Jerome O (Judge)

Case Events for Hope, Lauren v. Encompass Insurance Co Of America

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MAY 21, 2013 ORDER SIGNED BY: HERLIHY, JEROME O SO ORDERED (STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 52367589
ORDER
Docket Event CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 20, 2013 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 52334924
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL
Docket Event NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 15, 2013 PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES AND PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSET O DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 51137020
NOTICE SRV ANS INTERROGATORIES
Docket Event SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 20, 2013 ORDER SIGNED BY: HERLIHY, JEROME O CASE SCHEDULING ORDER: MOTIONS TO ADD OR AMEND APRIL 16, 2013; DISCOVERY DEADLINE JULY 15, 2013; FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AUGUST 14, 2013; ADR DEADLINE AUGUST 14, 2013; INTERIM STATUS REPORT AUGUST 23, 2013; STATUS CONFERENCE (TELECONFERENCE) SEPTEMBER 3, 2013 @ 9:30 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 49623667
SCHEDULING ORDER
Docket Event ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 16, 2013 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEFENDANT'S CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 49550837
ANSWER
Docket Event WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 14, 2013 WRIT RETURNED ON 2-13-13 - SERVED ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA BY LEAVING A COPY WITH INSURANCE COMMISSIONER KAREN WELDIN-STEWART ON 1-29-13 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 49517947
WRIT RETURN (GENERIC)
Docket Event WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 18, 2013 (2) WRITS ISSUED ON 1-17-13 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 48989091
WRIT ISSUED
Docket Event INITIAL FILING DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 8, 2013
INIT FILING DEBT/BREACH CONT
Docket Event INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 8, 2013 COMPLAINT PRAECIPE SUMMONS CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT RULE 3(H)(I)(II) AND (III) ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 48748300
INITIAL COMPLAINT
See all events