Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
City Of Hawthorne A Ca Municipal Corp., filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case against Petrone Filomena, Petrone Dominic, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Stuart M. Rice presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2010 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time66 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by CITY OF HAWTHORNE, a CA Municipal Corp. (Petitioner) |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Receiver |
|
September 26, 2011 | Hearing |
in Department B Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Receiver |
|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Clerk |
|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 28, 2011 | Hearing |
in Department B (Status Report Hearing; Matter continued) - |
|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by CITY OF HAWTHORNE, a CA Municipal Corp. (Petitioner) |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.