Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Straw David, filed a(n) Minor'S Compromise (General Jurisdiction) case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryMinor'S Compromise (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2312 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Torrance Clerk's Office, Vicencia, Michael P, Presiding Minor's Compromise Hearing - Not Held - Motion Off-Calendar Judge: Michael P |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Torrance Clerk's Office, Vicencia, Michael P, Presiding Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Michael P |
|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Torrance Clerk's Office, Vicencia, Michael P, Presiding Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Michael P |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (GRANTED Repres. By: MCWILLIAMS, ANNE, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: STRAW, DAVID, Petitioner ) | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (90277 Repres. By: MCWILLIAMS, ANNE, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: STRAW, DAVID, Petitioner ) | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Probate - Other (PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF ADULT PERSON WITH A DISABILITY 1st Hearing Date: 02/10/2010 Repres. By: MCWILLIAMS, ANNE, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: STRAW, DAVID, Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.