Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bowles Robert, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryGuardianship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 29, Green, Lesley C., Presiding Accounting Hearing - Not Held - Motion Off-Calendar Judge: Lesley C. |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Repres. By: BERGKVIST, MARGO A., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: BOWLES, ROBERT, Petitioner ) | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Receipt (DANIEL ROBERT MOEBUS-BOWLES Filed By: BOWLES, ROBERT, Petitioner Repres. By: BERGKVIST, MARGO A., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Approving Account (Repres. By: BERGKVIST, MARGO A., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: BOWLES, ROBERT, Petitioner ) | |
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 29, Green, Lesley C., Presiding Final Distribution Hearing - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Lesley C. |
|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Guardian ) | |
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 29, Green, Lesley C., Presiding Final Distribution Hearing Judge: Lesley C. |
|
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 29, Green, Lesley C., Presiding Final Distribution Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Lesley C. |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice (NTC OF CASE REASSIGNMENT Repres. By: BERGKVIST, MARGO A., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: BOWLES, ROBERT, Petitioner ) | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (06/17/13 Repres. By: BERGKVIST, MARGO A., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: BOWLES, ROBERT, Petitioner ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.