Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ifeanyi Charles, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alexander Jacqueline, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Philip S. Gutierrez presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 21, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions320 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time334 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Clerk | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Case sent to Dept J for processing on 6/20/17. ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Default | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 05-18-17 ) | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Unknown department: , Van Sicklen, Steven, Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.