Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hagos Elsa Gebremariam, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gebremariam Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time117 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hagos, Elsa - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-23 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (for Dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hagos, Elsa - Signed on 2015-09-23 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hagos, Elsa - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-23 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (for Dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hagos, Elsa - Signed on 2015-09-23 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice-Entry-Default (- Filed and Entered on 2015-09-22 ) | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice-Entry-Default (- Filed and Entered on 2015-09-22 ) | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hagos, Elsa - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-21 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and Final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hagos, Elsa - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-21 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hagos, Elsa ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-24-15 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.