Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia Steve, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bass Lauren Elizabeth, against Garcia Armida, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Glenda Veasey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time91 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Torrance Dept. - J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Moving Party Judge: Glenda |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Dismissal (and P.O.S - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Steve - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-10 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Dismissal (w/o-prejudice, as to Petition - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Steve ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Torrance Dept. - J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Request for Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner Judge: Glenda |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Agreement - Conciliation Court (- Signed on 2015-07-07 ) | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 07-02-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Steve - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Steve ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.