Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Torres Ernesto, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Asmar Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Maria Puente-Porras presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions419 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time459 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Signed on 2016-08-30 ) | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 (- Filed and Entered on 2016-08-30 ) | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-08-30 ) | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Judge Pro Tem/Referee (FOR COMMISSIONER MARIA PUENTE-PORRAS - Signed on 2016-08-30 ) | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Torrance Dept. - H, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up Judge: Maria |
|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request - Default Setting (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Torres, Ernesto - Hearing Set on 2016-08-30 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (w/ Default Setting Reason: Signature missing on form FAM031. Spousal support on FL-170 and FL-180 must be the same. ) | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Torres, Ernesto - Filed and Entered on 2016-04-15 ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.