Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Van Dinther John Francis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Van Dinther Ray Madeline, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions401 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time441 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Order (for spousal support (Resp) - Signed on 2015-12-09 ) | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Order (for spousal support (Resp) - Signed on 2015-12-09 ) | |
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Van Dinther, John Francis ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Van Dinther, John Francis ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Van Dinther, Ray Madeline - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-03 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Van Dinther, John Francis - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-03 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Van Dinther, John Francis - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-03 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Van Dinther, Ray Madeline - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-03 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation (and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - On Behalf of: Respondent: Van Dinther, Ray Madeline - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-24 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Van Dinther, Ray Madeline ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.