Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Berger Deborah Duke, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Burger Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1002 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1042 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous (1st appr. fees - On Behalf of: Respondent: Burger, Jeffrey - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-13 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (re: DMD 401(k) Plan , filed by QDRO preparer ) | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Rejection (stip QDRO - 1st appr. fees is required - Rejected on 2015-04-27 ) | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berger, Deborah - Filed and Entered on 2013-12-31 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berger, Deborah - Signed on 2013-12-31 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice-Entry-Default (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Burger, Jeffrey ) Filed by Respondent |
|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berger, Deborah ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (On 12-30-13 sent to Dept J for pro cessing. ) | |
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berger, Deborah - Filed and Entered on 2013-12-30 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Berger, Deborah - Filed and Entered on 2013-12-30 ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.