Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portillo Jose Ernesto, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bruers Stuart Edward, against Portillo Tiffany May, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Glenda Veasey presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions134 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time134 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (as to Resp. - Filed and Entered on 2013-01-04 ) | |
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Torrance Dept. - J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Glenda |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (, filed by petnr - Filed and Entered on 2012-10-19 ) | |
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Supplemental (declaration in opp to respondent's request for order , filed by petnr - Filed and Entered on 2012-10-19 ) | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Torrance Dept. - J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Glenda |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration (for return of children , filed by resp - Filed and Entered on 2012-09-17 ) | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice - Rejection (ex parte appl for transfer - - The court doesn't transfer cases to other states - Rejected on 2012-09-05 ) | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (served: 8/23/12 fld. by resp. - Filed and Entered on 2012-08-27 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.