Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jaffray Sarah Catherine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carroll Aaron Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions427 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time432 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (Re: Judgment - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jaffray, Sarah - Filed and Entered on 2011-10-21 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jaffray, Sarah - Filed and Entered on 2011-03-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jaffray, Sarah - Signed on 2011-03-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Sent to Dept SWH for processing - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jaffray, Sarah ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jaffray, Sarah ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (or Uncontested Dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jaffray, Sarah ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous | |
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment (First appearance fee of $355.00 is required. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jaffray, Sarah - Rejected on 2010-03-24 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation (and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Filed By: Petitioner: Jaffray, Sarah ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and Waiver - Filed By: Petitioner: Jaffray, Sarah ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.