Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Ruiz Kathleen, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bordin-Wosk Joshua, against Lamadrid Lucas, Marcotte Brian, Marymount California University, represented by Hartman Kathleen M, Mansukhani Roger M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Deirdre Hill presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management150 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions165 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Request for Dismissal
Date: July 07, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE
Date: July 07, 2020Separate Statement
Date: July 07, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF VIRGINIA IN SUPPORT
Date: July 07, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: July 07, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION WITH COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE AND EXHIBITS
Date: July 07, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF VIRGINIA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: July 07, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS OFF CAL.
Date: July 08, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 16, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 23, 2020Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT’S IMPROPER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: July 23, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 28, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: July 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SCHEDULING)
Date: July 29, 2020Notice - NOTICE 1. NOTICE OF THE SCHEDULING OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF
Date: August 10, 2020Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff); As to: BRIAN MARCOTTE (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of and Order re Stipulation; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Notice Of Errata To Plaintiff's Frist Amended Complaint; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of and FSC Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Declaration of BRT in support of Motion to Compel; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: BRIAN MARCOTTE (Defendant); MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Declaration of KMH in support of Motion to Compel; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff); As to: BRIAN MARCOTTE (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: BRIAN MARCOTTE (Defendant); MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Declaration of ABW in support of Motion to Compel; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Copendium of Evidence in Support of Motion to Compel; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Catherine Phan; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore -Alicia R. Desmond; Filed by:
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Further Responses; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant); As to: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Errata for Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant); As to: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Objection to Evidence; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Declaration of Virginia in Support; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Declaration of Kathleen Ruiz; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant); As to: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Opposition To Mtn for Sanctions; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Declaration of VK in Support of Mtn for Reconsideration; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Objection OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT?S IMPROPER PROPOSED ORDER; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN RUIZ
Date: August 27, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR SANCTIONS
Date: August 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF VK IN SUPPORT OF OPP
Date: August 27, 2020Reply - REPLY MCU'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MCU'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF
Date: September 02, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE)
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: September 10, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF VK IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: September 29, 2020Motion for Reconsideration
Date: September 29, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: December 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATES
Date: December 03, 2020Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: December 10, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: January 11, 2021Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Declaration with Compendium of Evidence and Exhibits; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Continued Motion Dates; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice Taking Motions Off Cal. Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Declaration of Virginia in support of Motion to Compel; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Sanctions: Filed By: LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration of VK in support of Opp; Filed by: KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Summons Filed by null
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendant's Motion to Compel Further Responses) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice (Of Errata To Plaintiff's Frist Amended Complaint) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice (of Errata for Motion for Protective Order) Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Answer (to Fourth Amended Complaint) Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Copendium of Evidence in Support of Motion to Compel Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses reque...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel IME)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses reque...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Catherine Phan) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Motion to Quash a Subpoena; Hearin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Motion Dates) Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice (Taking Motions Off Cal.) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Virginia in Support) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Completion of the Mandatory Settlement ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (of BRT in support of Motion to Compel) Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Declaration (of KMH in support of Motion to Compel) Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Complaint ((1st)) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to: Defendant Brian Marcotte only.) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion to Quash Subpoena of Plaintiff's Cell Phone Records an...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by BRIAN MARCOTTE (Defendant); MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Marymount California University's Ex Parte Applicat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Closure of the Pleadings; Status Conf...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by BRIAN MARCOTTE (Defendant); MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendants, Marymount California University, and Br...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of and Order re Stipulation) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff); KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Declaration (of ABW in support of Motion to Compel) Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (with Compendium of Evidence and Exhibits) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Virginia in support of Motion to Compel) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Adjudication) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT?S IMPROPER PROPOSED ORDER) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Completion of the Mandatory Settlement ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Opposition (To Mtn for Sanctions) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (of VK in support of Opp) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (of VK in Support of Mtn for Reconsideration) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Notice (of continued hearing dates) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Scheduling)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue Trial) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Kathleen Ruiz) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Motion to Quash (subpoena for cell phone records) Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by LUCAS LAMADRID (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of and FSC Order) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Fourth Amended Complaint for Damges Filed by KATHLEEN RUIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Reply (in support of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Shawn I. Pardo in support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Answer (to Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Notice (1. Notice of the Scheduling of Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protecitve Order)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set 2 and Set 3)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Closure of the Pleadings; Status Conf...))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. HARTMAN IN SUPPORT OF MCU'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Karen Thordarson in Support of Motion for Adjudication)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion to Quash Subpoena of Plaintiff's Cell Phone Records an...))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Copendium of Evidence in Support of Motion to Compel
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (request for production of documents set four)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Declaration (with Compendium of Evidence and Exhibits)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Reply to Marymount's Motion to Compel Cell Phone & Laptop)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Marymount's Motion to Compel Cell Phone & Laptop)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Set a Motion for Summary Judgment Date)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Motion to Quash (subpoena for cell phone records)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Deposition of Pedro Ladino)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Kathleen Ruiz)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Virginia in Support)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Declaration (of BRT in support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of and FSC Order)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of ABW in support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice (of Errata for Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel the Further Deposition of Plaintiff Kathleen Ruiz
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depo...))
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Bimali Walgampaya in support of Demurrer to the Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Marymount California University's Ex Parte Applicat...))
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of and Order re Stipulation)
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel ( Deposition of Defendant Marymount California University's Person Most Knowledgeable)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Declaration (of KMH in support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Answer (Defendant Dr. Lucas Lamadrid's answer to plaintiffs third amended complaint.)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Defendant Marymount California University's Notice of Motion and Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendants, Marymount California University, and Br...))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Kathleen Hartman in support of Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Protective Order re: Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Requests for Admissions)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Completion of the Mandatory Settlement ...))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice (3. Notice of the Scheduling of Motion for Protective Order re: Plaintiffs SPROG3)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice (Of Errata To Plaintiff's Frist Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Motion to Quash a Subpoena; Hearin...))
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on Defendant's Motion for an Independent Mental Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Additional Disputed Material Facts and Supporting Evidence)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Declaration (of VK in Support of Mtn for Reconsideration)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Request for production set 3)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Plaintiff Kathleen Ruiz's Opposition to Defendant's Motion and for Monetary Sanctions
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendant's Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (request for production of documents set three)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward L. Schumann in Support of Motion for Adjudication)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulated Protetive Order)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel Independent Mental Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admissions, Set Four)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to: Defendant Brian Marcotte only.)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Karen Thordarson in support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Kaitlyn Q. Chang ISO Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Errata Declaration of Kaitlin Q. Chang in Support of Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Virginia in support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Catherine Phan)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Kathleen M. Hartman in support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice (2. Notice of the Scheduling of Motion for Protective Order re: Plaintiffs RFA6)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Cell Phone Records and Gym Records Subpeonas)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Commission for Out of State Subpoena to Pedro Ladino)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Motion re: (Enforce Deposition Subpoena for Production of Documents and Things to the ADD-SOI Center)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff's Brief in support of Motion to Quash Subpoena to Verizon Wireless)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Fourth Amended Complaint for Damges
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. HARTMAN IN SUPPORT OF MCU'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. HARTMAN IN SUPPORT OF MCU'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Motion Dates)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel IME))
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice (Taking Motions Off Cal.)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT?S IMPROPER PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Completion of the Mandatory Settlement ...))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depo...))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice (of continued hearing dates)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. HARTMAN IN SUPPORT OF MCU'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Objection (to the Declaration of Virginia G. Ksadzhikyan)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00DEFENDANT MARYMOUNT CALIFORNIA UNIVERSITY'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT LUCAS LAMADRID'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate))
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Scheduling))
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. HARTMAN IN SUPPORT OF MCU'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Declaration (of VK in support of Opp)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. HARTMAN IN SUPPORT OF MCU'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Reply (MCU'S Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to MCU's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses reque...))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses reque...))
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Opposition (To Mtn for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel ( Deposition of Defendant Marymount California University's Person Most Knowledgeable)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses reque...))
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses reque...))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Shawn I. Pardo in support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Karen Thordarson in support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Kathleen M. Hartman in support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Marymount California University's Ex Parte Applicat...))
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Set a Motion for Summary Judgment Date)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Deposition of Pedro Ladino)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Motion Dates)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Karen Thordarson in Support of Motion for Adjudication)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward L. Schumann in Support of Motion for Adjudication)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Kaitlyn Q. Chang ISO Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admissions, Set Four)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Protective Order re: Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Requests for Admissions)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice (of Errata for Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel Independent Mental Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel IME))
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on Defendant's Motion for an Independent Mental Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Objection (to the Declaration of Virginia G. Ksadzhikyan)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depo...))
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depo...))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/10/2020)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Kathleen Hartman in support of Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Declaration (with Compendium of Evidence and Exhibits)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Virginia in support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Virginia in Support)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice (Taking Motions Off Cal.)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Additional Disputed Material Facts and Supporting Evidence)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT?S IMPROPER PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Completion of the Mandatory Settlement ...))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice (Of Errata To Plaintiff's Frist Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/24/2018 and Order re Stipulation)
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Answer (Defendant Dr. Lucas Lamadrid's answer to plaintiffs third amended complaint.)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Bimali Walgampaya in support of Demurrer to the Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulated Protetive Order)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 02/28/2019 and FSC Order)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Motion re: (Enforce Deposition Subpoena for Production of Documents and Things to the ADD-SOI Center)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Reply (in support of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to: Defendant Brian Marcotte only.)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendants, Marymount California University, and Br...))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Declaration (of BRT in support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Declaration (of ABW in support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Declaration (of KMH in support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Motion to Quash (subpoena for cell phone records)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set 2 and Set 3)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protecitve Order)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Marymount's Motion to Compel Cell Phone & Laptop)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Commission for Out of State Subpoena to Pedro Ladino)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Reply to Marymount's Motion to Compel Cell Phone & Laptop)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Cell Phone Records and Gym Records Subpeonas)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Answer (to Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (request for production of documents set three)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Motion to Quash a Subpoena; Hearin...))
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (request for production of documents set four)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Catherine Phan)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Request for production set 3)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff's Brief in support of Motion to Quash Subpoena to Verizon Wireless)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion to Quash Subpoena of Plaintiff's Cell Phone Records an...))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Closure of the Pleadings; Status Conf...))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendant's Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Opposition (To Mtn for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Kathleen Ruiz)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate))
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Declaration (of VK in support of Opp)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Reply (MCU'S Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to MCU's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Declaration (of VK in Support of Mtn for Reconsideration)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Completion of the Mandatory Settlement ...))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice (of continued hearing dates)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Scheduling))
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Notice (1. Notice of the Scheduling of Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice (3. Notice of the Scheduling of Motion for Protective Order re: Plaintiffs SPROG3)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice (2. Notice of the Scheduling of Motion for Protective Order re: Plaintiffs RFA6)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Deirdre Hill |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Plaintiff's Subpoena) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion to Quash (Plaintiff's Subpoena) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Deirdre Hill |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Deirdre Hill |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Deirdre Hill |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Deirdre Hill |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Deirdre Hill |
|
March 16, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Quash (Plaintiff's Subpoena) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Deirdre Hill |
|
March 16, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Deirdre Hill |
|
March 16, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Deirdre Hill |
|
March 16, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Deirdre Hill |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.