Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ennio Schiappa Homes Inc. A California Corporation, Little Rascals Limited Partnership A California Limited Partnership, La Piazza Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Schiappa Luigi, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Orr Robert M., Orr Robert Macgregor, against La Piazza Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Luigi Schiappa Development Inc. A California Corporation, Schiappa Luigi, represented by Fields Mark Curtis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Ramona G. See presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management136 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions187 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ENNIO SHIAPPA HOMES, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Reply - Reply Reply to Opposition To Demurrer
Date: January 31, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: February 13, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike To Plaintiffs'...)
Date: February 06, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: February 13, 2019Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR REFORMATION OF PROMISSORY NOTE
Date: April 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 08, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 04, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 02, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 09, 2019Answer
Date: May 02, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 18, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON
Date: November 08, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 19, 2019Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: November 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2020
Date: March 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020
Date: April 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 14, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: May 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: November 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: March 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: July 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: December 16, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition To Demurrer)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Answer (Answer by defendants Luigi Schiappa Development, Inc. and L.A. Piazza, LLC)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike To Plaintiffs'...))
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00[Proposed] Order on Stipulation to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (Cross-complaint for Reformation of Promissory note)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Stipulation to Continue Trial Date, and [Proposed] Order Thereon
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/23/2020)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 03, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 03, 2018Order to Show Cause (Hearing) - HEARING
Date: August 21, 2018Complaint
Date: August 03, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -
Date: August 27, 2018Notice - Order to show cause hearing
Date: August 30, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: October 31, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 29, 2018Opposition - Opposition OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: January 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 31, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.