Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Beshara Refaat, Gardena Senior Housing Inc., Csi Support And Development Servicesdoe1, Mj Housing & Services Doe 2, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Evans Chris J., Truong Tiffany Dang, against Beshara Refaat, Csi Support And Development Servicesdoe1, Gardena Senior Housing Inc., Mj Housing & Services Doe 2, National Church Residences Doe 3, (total of 5) See All represented by Barrett William George, Cheng Tony Jay-Lun, Chin Archie, Hernandez George James Jr, Weinstein Michael Robert, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Deirdre Hill presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management154 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 03, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions760 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1078 days |
Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)
Date: December 03, 2019Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: January 15, 2020Answer - Answer To Cross-Complaint
Date: October 24, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: First Amended Complaint
Date: February 23, 2018Amended Complaint -
Date: August 15, 2018Opposition - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2018Amended Complaint -
Date: August 22, 2018Amended Complaint -
Date: August 27, 2018Cross-Complaint -
Date: September 21, 2018Cross-Complaint -
Date: September 27, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 17, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT (PARTIAL) FOR POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2019Order - Order RE: MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 29, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Motion
Date: June 22, 2018Opposition - MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: August 06, 2018Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: May 07, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: May 17, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 31, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: June 06, 2019Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: June 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: June 12, 2019Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: August 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; HE...)
Date: September 17, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM THE TRUTH OF MATTERS
Date: September 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION TO DEEM THE TRUTH OF MATTERS...)
Date: September 24, 2019Complaint
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Order (RE: MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Cross-Complainant National Church Residences' Cross Complaint
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (On Ex parte)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Application of Plaintiff for an Order for the Settle...))
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Answer (To Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Parties are ordered to report on the status of p...))
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER FOR PARTIES TO APPEAR ON MARCH 18, 2019)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Request (Request for Waiver of Personal Appearance at MSC and Proposed Order)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Application and Order to Appoint Guardian ad Litem)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice (Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Appoint Guard...))
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference and/or Case Management Conference; S...))
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference and/or Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert Hernandez in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Tiffany Truong in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Gardena Senior Housing Inc.'s Notice of Lodgement in Support of of its Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00{Proposed} Order
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Mo...))
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Tiffany D Truong)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re: Gardena Senior Housing, Inc., Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF TIFFANY D. TRUONG)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Judgment ((Partial) FOR POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Motion for Order Establishing Admissions and For Monetary Sanctions
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Order)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Writ of (possession)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice (Of Non-Receipt Of Opposition)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (-Partial)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (-Partial.)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...))
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION TO DEEM THE TRUTH OF MATTERS...))
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Writ of (Writ of Possession Of Real Property)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Writ of (-Return)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice (filed judgment for reference)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Writ Return un-used
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Writ of (of Possession)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts and Supporting Evidence)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Table of Exhibits
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Archie Chin)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Hearing on Motio...))
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: July 02, 2020Order - Dismissal
Date: July 02, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/04/2020)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/20/2020)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Cross-Complaint of MJ Housing and Service)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.