Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fung Helen, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Law Offices Of Steven J. Cooper, against Aim United Llc, Alvarez John, Angel Brian, Baca Nicholas Ryan, Bdr Inc., (total of 14) See All represented by Lear Sherry Anne, Smythe Law Group, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Mark C. Kim presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management271 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions565 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time659 days |
Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 12, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 12, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 02, 2018Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: October 10, 2017Minute Order - PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION
Date: October 16, 2017Notice - DEFT OREGON TRAIL CORP'S NTC. OF MOTION & MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTY FEES
Date: October 23, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION
Date: October 23, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: December 06, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION FOR AN ORDER
Date: December 18, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION FOR AN ORDER
Date: January 19, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION
Date: May 02, 2018Complaint
Date: September 21, 2016Complaint
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Request-Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Order-Court Fee Waiver
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice - Challenge
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice - Challange ( AS TO JUDGE RAMONA SEE )
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF PLT COUNSEL RE: STATUS OF PROSECUTION OF CIVIL ACTION )
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Civil Deposit - Jury fees paid by Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Order-Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED FOR JURY FEES AND EXPENSES )
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Amended Notice
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Amended Notice (OF RELATED CASES )
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (#5 AS TO FACTS )
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (#4 RE PLEADINGS FILED IN YC072585 )
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (@2 RE PLEADINGS FILED IN LAXC CASE NUMBER YC070058 )
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (#3 RE PLEADINGS FILED IN LASC CASE NUMBER YC070091 )
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (#1 RE: RECORDED DOCS )
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00CCP 170.6 Application Filed (PREEMPTORY CHALLENGE 170.6 FILE AGAINST JUDGE, STUART M. RICE )
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEDULING DEMURRER TO COMP )
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order (Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion)
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (Number 4 Re Case Number YC071585)
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Deft Oregon Trail Corp's Ntc. of Motion & Motion for Award of Atty Fees
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (Number 2 Re Case Number YC070058)
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (Number 1 Re Recorded Documents)
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Memo of Costs
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (Number 3 Re Case Number YC070991)
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Supplement
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Plaintiff Helen Fung's opposition to Deft.'s Ex Parte appl. for shamelessly slander to Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Partial Judgment (not entire case)
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Partial Judgment (not entire case)
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Memo of Costs
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Memo of Costs
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice (OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL )
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record (RESPONDENT )
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT FOR INTERST $73.13 )
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Unknown Document Type
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Remittitur filed
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Motion for Order (motion opposition to defendants wrongful declaration)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Writ-Other (WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES $66,731.34 V.A.S. )
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: June 28, 2019Opposition (OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS AIM UNITED AND BRIAN ANGEL TO UNNAMED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re Documents Received from Helen Fung on 9/25/2018;))
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Opposition (of Defendant BDR, Inc.'s to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order opposition to defendant's wrongfu...))
Date: March 21, 2019Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B289707)
Date: September 10, 2020Memorandum of Costs on Appeal
Date: August 14, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.