Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Upside Cip L.P. A Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Seide Richard L., against Hunt Treasure, Galore Bargains, Discount Marketplace Inc. A Calif. Corp, represented by Petersen Richard P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Cary Nishimoto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 10, 2010 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department E Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Matter Placed Off Calendar) - |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by UPSIDE CIP, L.P., A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff) |
|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department E Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department E (Court's Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) - |
|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by UPSIDE CIP, L.P., A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Trial Setting Filed by UPSIDE CIP, L.P., A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by DISCOUNT MARKETPLACE, INC., A CALIF. CORP (Defendant) |
|
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department E (Court's Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by UPSIDE CIP, L.P., A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff) |
|
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.