Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Munakash Robert, Sunset And Pch Properties Llc, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by ., against Card Zachary A., Cb Richard Ellis Inc., Cb Richard Ellis Usa, Martin Mark, represented by Gordon & Rees Llp, Peyton Robert W., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with William G. Willett presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management160 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2010 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions93 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time771 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Previously Dismissed) - |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by ROBERT MUNAKASH (Plaintiff); SUNSET AND PCH PROPERTIES LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by ROBERT MUNAKASH (Plaintiff); SUNSET AND PCH PROPERTIES LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC. (Defendant); ZACHARY A. CARD (Defendant); MARK MARTIN (Defendant) |
|
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by CB RICHARD ELLIS, INC. (Defendant); ZACHARY A. CARD (Defendant); MARK MARTIN (Defendant) |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Matter Placed Off Calendar) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.