Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Greater California Financial Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Szczepanski, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Gordon S. Baranco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time143 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Greater California Financial Company LLC
Date: December 30, 2005Initial Collection Case Review Commenced and Completed
Date: May 22, 2006Complaint - Collections Dismissed
Date: May 22, 2006Initial Collection Case Review 05/22/2006 09:00 AM D- 15
Date: April 03, 2006Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: December 30, 2005Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kevin Szczepanski Filed
Date: March 15, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.