Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Law, Nam, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Pham, Tuan Anh, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions29 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time50 days |
Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To Tuan Anh Pham Filed
Date: January 11, 2006Request Re: Dismissal /1169 - partial as to money damages Filed
Date: January 27, 2006Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Filed for Nam Law
Date: 2005-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: January 11, 2006Summons with Proof of Service As to Tuan Anh Pham Filed
Date: January 11, 2006Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: February 01, 2006Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Granted
Date: 2005-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2005-12-14T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2005-12-13T00:00:00Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: January 11, 2006Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Nam Law
Date: 2005-12-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.