Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Great Seneca Financial Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Haileselassie, Amare S, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions91 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2050 days |
Default Judgment (Money) Entered
Date: March 14, 2006Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Great Seneca Financial Corporation
Date: December 13, 2005Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 14, 2006Initial Collection Case Review 05/03/2006 02:00 PM D- 303
Date: March 14, 2006Proof of Service on Complaint As to Amare S Haileselassie Filed
Date: February 08, 2006Substitution of Attorney Filed for Great Seneca Financial Corporation
Date: July 25, 2011Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2005-12-13T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Notice of Change of Address
Date: February 16, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.