Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Palisades Collection Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Eden, James, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Jacqueline Taber presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time255 days |
Case Management Statement of Palisades Collection LLC Filed
Date: 2006-04-10T00:00:00Initial Collection Case Review 04/27/2006 04:00 PM D- 131
Date: 2006-03-06T00:00:00Initial Collection Case Review Commenced and Completed
Date: 2006-04-27T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: July 07, 2006Collection Case Review Order Issued
Date: July 06, 2006Collection Case Continuance Commenced and Completed
Date: July 06, 2006Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 17, 2006Case Management Statement of Palisades Collection LLC Filed
Date: June 20, 2006Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Palisades Collection LLC
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Collection Case Review Order Issued
Date: 2006-04-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.