Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gcfs Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Davis, Janice C., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions44 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1551 days |
Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2006-01-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for GCFS Inc.
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for GCFS Inc.
Date: November 02, 2007Substitution of Attorney Filed for GCFS Inc.
Date: April 09, 2007Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for GCFS Inc.
Date: April 07, 2006Judgment Entered
Date: 2006-02-23T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: 2006-02-07T00:00:00Default Entered as to Janice C. Davis. Judgment NOT Entered; Rejection Letter Issued
Date: 2006-01-18T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2005-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Janice C. Davis Filed
Date: 2005-12-20T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Janice C. Davis Filed
Date: 2006-01-18T00:00:00Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for GCFS Inc.
Date: March 23, 2006Substitution of Attorney Filed for GCFS Inc.
Date: March 05, 2010Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from San Francisco Filed
Date: December 09, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.