Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Colclough, Robert J, Iii, against Jimenez, Ricardo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
937582-2 J Writ of Execution Issued |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
937582-1 J Memorandum |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
937582A Substitution of Attorney |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
937582A-2 Writ of Execution Issued |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
937582A-1 Memorandum of Costs (Summary/Appeal) |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.