Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells, Heidi, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Anderson, Mark Allen, Weiss, Reba, against College Place School District No. 250, represented by Mcfarland, Michael Early, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts with Brandon L. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrandon L. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal & Stipulation Judge: Johnson, Brandon L |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Reba Weiss |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Mark Anderson |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.