Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Segraves, Elmer, Snyder, Kathryn, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Geidl Gonzales, Mona Jane, against Clean Home, Llc, Sweeney, Matthew J., Wesco Insurance Company, represented by Ortuno, Paul Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts with M. Scott Wolfram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeM. Scott Wolfram Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2019 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Trust Fund Ledger | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Pay Monies from Court Registry |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Disclosure of Lay & Expert Witnesses-Pltff's |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.