Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Schwanenberg, Christine, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hyndman, Jeremy Scott, against Warwick, Meghan E, The Villages Of Garrison Creek Master Property Managment Assoc, The Villages Of Garrison Creek Phase X, Division Of Child Support, Department Of Health & Human Services, (total of 7) See All represented by De Grasse, Michael Edward, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Office Receipt on Deed 03/08/21 |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Confirming Sale | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing SALE OF LAND FOR CONFIRMATION Judge: Wolfram, M. Scott |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order Confirming Sale |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Unclaimed | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.