Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Certifications Indigent Defense, Indigent Defense Counsel 2018, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2018 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certification 4TH QTR |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certification 3RD QTR |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certification 2ND QTR |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certification 2ND QUARTER |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certification 1: CERTIFICATION; |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVED; | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.