Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hazar Developement Inc, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Kalikow, Barnett N., against Cryptobravos, Griffis, Jasseamine, Griffis, Timothy, Ness, Samuel A., Team Media Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Kee, C Scott, Reiten, Mary B, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Mistachkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Mistachkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Judge Mistachkin to hear - fees and costs Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Glenn Simms in support of |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Michael Vellani in support of |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Evan Spicer in support |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Objection Opposition | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Barnett Kalikow in support of |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of withdrawal without prejudice of motion |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit in support of |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.