Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
City Of Aberdeen, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, National Fire And Marine Insurance Co, Rsui Indemnity Company, Washington Cities Insurance Authority, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Siddiki, Adil A, against Does 1-10, Mckinstry Co. Llc, represented by Floyd, Francis Stanley, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Mistachkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Mistachkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 05, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Stipulated with |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 18 days |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Edwards, David L |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Nt of Settlement, Vacate Trial Date Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 18 days |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Disclosure | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Amended Case Schedule Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.