Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chappel, Josette, Peterson, David, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dobbins, Jeremey Donn, against Heritage Restoration Inc, represented by Rayan, Todd S, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2020 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.