Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Romero Yvette, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Arana Alma E., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Charles Q. Clay III presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryOther Family Law (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court-Petition Granted |
Case Cycle Time23 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL (APPELLANT) ) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Appellant |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Appellant |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Appellant |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Appellant |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Appellant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.