Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ruiz Patricia M., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael A. Latin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Report - Court Investigator | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Letters (On Behalf of: RUIZ, PATRICIA M., Petitioner Filed By: POULOS, CHRISTOPHER A., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Ex Parte - Application (On Behalf of: RUIZ, PATRICIA M., Petitioner Filed By: POULOS, CHRISTOPHER A., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Letters (Filed By: RUIZ, PATRICIA M., Petitioner ) | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Ex Parte - Application (for issuance of amended letters of conservatorship; Filed By: RUIZ, PATRICIA M., Petitioner ) | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (Filed By: RUIZ, PATRICIA M., Petitioner ) | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (Filed By: RUIZ, PATRICIA M., Petitioner ) | |
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Letters (Filed By: RUIZ, PATRICIA M., Petitioner Repres. By: POULOS, CHRISTOPHER A., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Conservator (Filed By: RUIZ, PATRICIA M., Petitioner Repres. By: POULOS, CHRISTOPHER A., Attorney for Petitioner ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.