Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Ansari, Amidah Z, Ansari, Aneesah, Ansari, Qaadir A, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John P. Vander Feer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2006 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian Filed
Date: August 07, 2006Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: May 01, 2014Comment:
Date: May 07, 2014Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 22, 2014Declaration Filed
Date: May 22, 2014Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 08, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: September 09, 2019Petition for Termination of Guardianship Filed
Date: June 14, 2013Notice of Hearing
Date: July 22, 2013Order Terminating Guardianship Filed
Date: July 31, 2013Request to File New Litigation by Vexatious Litigant Filed
Date: March 18, 2014Consent of Guardian
Date: August 07, 2006Ord to File New Litigation by Vexatious Litigant Signd/Filed
Date: March 20, 2014Petition for Termination of Guardianship Filed
Date: March 27, 2014Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted
Date: March 27, 2014Notice of Change of Address for Party Filed
Date: April 02, 2014Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 16, 2014Request for Special Notice Filed
Date: May 03, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 09, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 22, 2014Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 22, 2014Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 22, 2014Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 19, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 22, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: February 22, 2021Request to File New Litigation by Vexatious Litigant Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: August 07, 2006Declaration Under UCCJEA filed
Date: August 07, 2006Request for Waiver of Fees and Costs is Denied
Date: August 08, 2006Order Prescribing Notice Filed
Date: August 10, 2006Temporary Letters Issued
Date: August 16, 2006Order Dispensing with Notice Filed
Date: August 10, 2006Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: August 16, 2006Notice of Hearing
Date: August 28, 2006Declaration Filed
Date: September 15, 2006Declaration Filed
Date: August 28, 2006Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 04, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 15, 2006Declaration Filed
Date: September 15, 2006Order Appointing Guardian of the Minor
Date: September 29, 2006Letters Issued
Date: September 29, 2006Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: August 16, 2008Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: August 07, 2006Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed
Date: August 07, 2006Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: June 27, 2014Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: July 07, 2014Order Filed Re:
Date: November 17, 2011Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: May 03, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File LETTER FROM ANEESAH ANSARI PLACED IN FILE |
|
February 22, 2021 | Hearing | Document(s) Placed in File Comment LETTER FROM ANEESAH ANSARI PLACED IN FILE | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File LETTER FROM ANEESAH ANSARI PLACED IN FILE |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) RECEIVED BACK FROM ANEESAH ANSARI-UNABLE TO FORWARD-NOT DELIVERABLE. |
|
October 17, 2019 | Hearing | Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Comment RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) RECEIVED BACK FROM ANEESAH ANSARI-UNABLE TO FORWARD-NOT DELIVERABLE. | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) RECEIVED BACK FROM ANEESAH ANSARI-UNABLE TO FORWARD-NOT DELIVERABLE. |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER TO FILE NEW LITIGATION BY VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILED |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): PREFILING ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE ORDER TO FILE NEW LITIGATION WAS DENIED. |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ORDER PRESCRIBING IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ORDER TO FILE NEW LITIGATION WAS DENIED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.