Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Great Seneca Financial Corp., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Ping-Lien, L C, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To L C Ping-Lien Filed
Date: March 17, 2006Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: December 30, 2005Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Great Seneca Financial Corp.
Date: December 30, 2005Initial Collection Case Review 05/23/2006 02:00 PM D- 707
Date: March 30, 2006Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 19, 2006Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 25, 2006Proof of Service on Complaint As to L C Ping-Lien Filed
Date: January 25, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.