Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A., A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Banta, Paulette K, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Proof of Service on Complaint As to Paulette K Banta Filed
Date: January 23, 2006Stipulation Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for Paulette K Banta
Date: March 07, 2006Notice of Settlement Filed for Chase Bank USA, N.A., a corporation
Date: March 07, 2006Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 23, 2006Stipulation Re: Entry of Judgment Denied
Date: March 09, 2006Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Date: 2005-12-13T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2005-12-13T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 02, 2006Compliance Hearing 09/15/2011 03:30 PM D- 705
Date: March 07, 2006Initial Collection Case Review 05/05/2006 02:00 PM D- 704
Date: March 13, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.