Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Herrera, Jose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Dubois, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Frank Roesch presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions524 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time793 days |
Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/02/2006 01:30 PM D- 707
Date: 2006-03-21T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2005-12-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kpse Herrera
Date: 2005-12-13T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/02/2006 02:00 PM D- 707
Date: 2006-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2006-05-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Jason Dubois
Date: January 03, 2008Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition Filed for Defendant
Date: 2006-11-02T00:00:00Returned Mail: Minute Order Received
Date: May 29, 2007Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2006-11-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2006-07-10T00:00:00Dismissal Court Ordered With Prejudice Filed
Date: May 21, 2007Motion to Dismiss Claim of Jose Herrera Filed by Jason Dubois
Date: 2007-04-18T00:00:00Judgment Entire Action Filed
Date: February 14, 2008Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2007-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2006-10-23T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Filed
Date: November 14, 2007Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2006-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jason Dubois Filed
Date: 2006-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jason Dubois Filed
Date: 2006-07-13T00:00:00Withdrawal of Attorney Filed for Jose Herrera
Date: 2007-03-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2006-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jose Herrera Filed
Date: 2006-10-20T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2007-03-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous Case Management Conference order Filed
Date: 2006-05-02T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2007-02-21T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss Granted
Date: May 21, 2007Proposed Judgment Received
Date: January 08, 2008Judgment Entered
Date: February 14, 2008Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted
Date: 2007-03-20T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2007-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition Granted
Date: 2006-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed
Date: 2007-05-18T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Jason Dubois
Date: 2006-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2007-01-16T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2007-05-21T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2006-12-05T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2007-05-14T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Granted in Part
Date: 2007-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jason Dubois Filed
Date: 2007-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jose Herrera Filed
Date: 2006-07-05T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed for Defendant
Date: 2007-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Service order granting motion to be relieved as counsel Filed
Date: 2007-04-10T00:00:00Declaration in Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by Jason Du
Date: 2007-02-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Jason Dubois
Date: October 12, 2007For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.