Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Agarwal Sanjay, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Valdez Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions339 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time339 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Agarwal, Sanjay ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Valdez, Jessica ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Agarwal, Sanjay ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Agarwal, Sanjay ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Agarwal, Sanjay ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Agarwal, Sanjay - Signed on 2016-05-02 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Agarwal, Sanjay ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Norwalk Dept. - L, Horan, James E., Presiding Short Cause Trial - Judgment - Granted - Before Evidence Judge: James E. |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Valdez, Jessica ) Filed by Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.