Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Godoy Lilia M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gascon Frank Jr, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Margaret Miller presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions144 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time159 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Norwalk Dept. - Z, Bernal, Margaret Miller, Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Margaret Miller |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (For Dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Godoy, Lilia - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-04 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (For Dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Godoy, Lilia - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-04 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (For Dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Godoy, Lilia - Signed on 2015-11-04 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Godoy, Lilia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Godoy, Lilia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Godoy, Lilia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 10-08-15 ) | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.