Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzalez Beatriz Serrano, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gonzalez Alfred Jose, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions211 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time226 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment (for dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Beatriz - Filed and Entered on 2011-10-07 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Beatriz - Filed and Entered on 2011-10-07 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Beatriz - Filed and Entered on 2011-10-07 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Beatriz ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Beatriz ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (FINAL - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Beatriz ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (PERSONALLY SERVED 3/14/11 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Beatriz ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Beatriz ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Beatriz ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.