Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dominguez Robert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dominguez Aurora, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with William J. Birney, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 15, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions55 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time181 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Norwalk Dept. - P, Birney, William, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made Judge: Birney William |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Norwalk Dept. - P, Birney, William, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made Judge: William |
|
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Dominguez, Robert - Filed and Entered on 2011-01-16 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Dominguez, Robert - Filed and Entered on 2011-01-16 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Dominguez, Robert - Filed and Entered on 2011-01-16 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Dominguez, Robert - Filed and Entered on 2011-01-16 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Dominguez, Robert ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Dominguez, Robert ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice - Rejection (REJ X1 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.