Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hawman Chasidy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gracia Jose, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions266 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time291 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hawman, Chasidy - Filed and Entered on 2010-10-18 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hawman, Chasidy - Filed and Entered on 2010-10-18 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hawman, Chasidy ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hawman, Chasidy ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hawman, Chasidy ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement - Financial (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hawman, Chasidy ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hawman, Chasidy ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hawman, Chasidy ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hawman, Chasidy ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hawman, Chasidy - Granted on 2009-12-31 ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.